Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 959 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 4284 Week
» 4284 Month
» 71146 Year
» 1736522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #866
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6185   12/05/1928
O4 5406   04/03/1933
O4 6358   09/03/1935
O4 6500   10/07/1937
O4 6346   21/10/1939
O4 761   04/10/1941