Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 25 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 866 Week
» 14802 Month
» 142245 Year
» 1807621 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3257
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6532   08/08/1936
O4 6208   09/11/1940
O4 6328   24/07/1943
O4 6640   03/03/1945
O4 3671   17/06/1947