Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 466 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5453 Week
» 13568 Month
» 141011 Year
» 1806387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #22256
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63832   05/04/1952
O4 63587   02/10/1954
O4 63617   14/09/1957
O4 63671   22/12/1960