Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 879 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5506 Week
» 7244 Month
» 134687 Year
» 1800063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #932
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5408   11/12/1928
O4 5385   06/07/1929
O4 6257   20/02/1931
O4 6218   13/01/1934
O4 6192   27/06/1936
O4 6364   25/03/1939
O4 6497   02/08/1941