Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 46 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2844 Week
» 14526 Month
» 167479 Year
» 1832855 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #512
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6223   22/03/1924
O4 5408   20/08/1929
O4 6635   19/09/1931
O4 6278   20/01/1934
O4 6326   29/03/1941
O4 6594   13/11/1943