Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1065 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7748 Week
» 18794 Month
» 18794 Year
» 1684170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3213
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6230   12/10/1935
O4 6536   06/11/1937
O4 6309   06/04/1940
O4 5408   21/11/1942
O4 6229   17/02/1945
O4 3690   03/05/1947
O4 63713   17/12/1949