Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3572 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16978 Week
» 69994 Month
» 189521 Year
» 3216374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1757
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
2006 |
|
03/1919 |
O4 |
380 |
|
01/12/1923 |
O4 |
6367 |
|
18/09/1926 |
O4 |
5069 |
|
22/03/1930 |
O4 |
6283 |
|
27/08/1932 |
O4 |
6377 |
|
01/09/1934 |
|