Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 542 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1450 Week
» 12595 Month
» 112380 Year
» 1777756 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3301
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6563   07/08/1937
O4 6506   08/08/1942
O4 6309   14/10/1944
O4 3580   05/04/1947
O4 63736   08/10/1949