Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 15 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 15 Week
» 18067 Month
» 250987 Year
» 1916363 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3389
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6536   16/03/1940
O4 5380   24/12/1942
O4 5418   18/11/1944
O4 3883   16/11/1946
O4 63580   06/08/1949