Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 771 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 771 Week
» 19672 Month
» 19672 Year
» 1685048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1314
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5346   14/04/1928
O4 6567   01/04/1933
O4 6262   30/03/1935
O4 6581   01/05/1937
O4 6631   03/08/1938
O4 5418   06/04/1940