Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 37 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5594 Week
» 16739 Month
» 116524 Year
» 1781900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #815
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5394   08/10/1927
O4 6259   26/05/1933
O4 5346   12/10/1935
O4 6517   12/11/1938
O4 6625   08/02/1941
O4 5015   08/05/1943
O4 6582   09/03/1946
O4 63715   05/06/1948