Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 484 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5471 Week
» 13586 Month
» 141029 Year
» 1806405 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #865
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6217   14/04/1928
O4 6357   13/01/1933
O4 5348   30/03/1935
O4 6319   23/10/1937
O4 6626   11/05/1940
O4 5385   12/09/1942
O4 3840   01/10/1947