Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 285 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1126 Week
» 15062 Month
» 142505 Year
» 1807881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1773
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 376   30/11/1918
O4 349   28/10/1921
O4 6342   12/10/1926
O4 6265   17/01/1931
O4 6268   03/06/1933
O4 6256   03/08/1935