Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 52 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2978 Week
» 4716 Month
» 132159 Year
» 1797535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3304
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6592   24/07/1937
O4 6310   02/09/1939
O4 6261   07/03/1942
O4 5349   30/09/1944
O4 3877   12/10/1947
O4 63797   07/01/1950