Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 422 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4914 Week
» 29748 Month
» 64080 Year
» 1729456 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3685
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6211   20/06/1942
O4 6586   24/06/1944
O4 3508   07/12/1946
O4 63634   19/06/1948