Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 410 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5397 Week
» 13512 Month
» 140955 Year
» 1806331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1145
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1692   01/1919
O4 6319   04/07/1924
O4 6292   22/10/1929
O4 5351   03/10/1931
O4 6374   20/01/1934
O4 6302   19/09/1936