Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 105 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3494 Week
» 22395 Month
» 22395 Year
» 1687771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3233
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6309   07/03/1936
O4 6594   26/03/1938
O4 6588   02/11/1940
O4 6354   19/08/1942
O4 5352   17/03/1945
O4 3691   10/09/1947
O4 63812   29/01/1949