Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 641 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6172 Week
» 31006 Month
» 65338 Year
» 1730714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3366
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6293   22/04/1939
O4 5353   25/01/1941
O4 6224   27/11/1943
O4 3905   05/07/1947
O4 63898   31/12/1949