Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 39 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5596 Week
» 16741 Month
» 116526 Year
» 1781902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1198
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1933   07/1918
O4 5354   14/02/1925
O4 6210   01/11/1930
O4 6238   30/09/1933
O4 6624   22/02/1936
O4 6361   03/09/1938