Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 99 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 28351 Month
» 62683 Year
» 1728059 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1362
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1723   10/1918
O4 6284   22/03/1924
O4 6266   23/11/1929
O4 6302   14/01/1933
O4 5354   18/05/1935
O4 6345   27/04/1937
O4 6574   07/10/1939