Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 240 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4586 Week
» 4586 Month
» 71448 Year
» 1736824 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3278
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5354   20/03/1937
O4 5388   24/06/1939
O4 6188   20/06/1942
O4 6268   02/12/1944
O4 3920   23/11/1946
O4 63782   28/05/1949