Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 42 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5599 Week
» 16744 Month
» 116529 Year
» 1781905 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #949
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5375   30/08/1930
O4 5355   25/02/1933
O4 5394   27/04/1935
O4 6183   26/06/1937
O4 6581   06/01/1940
O4 6631   09/05/1942
O4 6561   19/05/1945
O4 3701   14/11/1947