Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 333 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5052 Week
» 16197 Month
» 115982 Year
» 1781358 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3269
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6597   19/12/1936
O4 5355   11/07/1942
O4 6575   29/04/1945
O4 6552   06/10/1945
O4 63604   26/04/1948