Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 280 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1121 Week
» 15057 Month
» 142500 Year
» 1807876 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1059
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1683   07/1918
O4 6183   19/03/1932
O4 6315   09/02/1935
O4 5415   10/10/1936
O4 6496   21/01/1939