Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 661 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6192 Week
» 31026 Month
» 65358 Year
» 1730734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #179
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 271   08/1914
O4 1184   15/10/1921
O4 6356   19/01/1929
O4 6315   09/05/1931
O4 6576   29/04/1933