Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 163 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2328 Week
» 2328 Month
» 69190 Year
» 1734566 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1149
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
C5 258 THE RT. HON. VISCOUNT CROSS G.C.B. G.C.S.I. 08/06/1918
O4 6497   30/06/1934
O4 6184   22/08/1936
O4 6305   23/09/1939
O4 6334   04/04/1942
O4 6264   24/03/1944
O4 3584   21/06/1947
O4 63659   06/05/1950