Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #518
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
1603 |
|
01/1918 |
O4 |
6245 |
|
21/06/1924 |
O4 |
6218 |
|
25/09/1926 |
O4 |
6352 |
|
14/10/1933 |
O4 |
6634 |
|
12/10/1935 |
O4 |
6529 |
|
18/09/1937 |
O4 |
6186 |
|
18/11/1939 |
|