Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 755 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 755 Week
» 19656 Month
» 19656 Year
» 1685032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3332
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6615   04/06/1938
O4 5022   04/05/1940
O4 6237   01/08/1942
O4 6187   03/03/1945
O4 3672   27/09/1947