Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3518 Week
» 28352 Month
» 62684 Year
» 1728060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1190
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6570   07/07/1934
O4 6611   17/10/1936
O4 6188   15/07/1939
O4 5012   05/09/1942
O4 5422   03/03/1945
O4 3612   11/09/1947