Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 941 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24572 Week
» 89526 Month
» 292190 Year
» 3319043 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #940
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
6209 |
|
24/09/1929 |
O4 |
6189 |
|
29/12/1931 |
O4 |
6541 |
|
16/02/1935 |
O4 |
6320 |
|
10/07/1937 |
O4 |
6593 |
|
12/08/1939 |
O4 |
778 |
|
11/10/1941 |
|