Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 58 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2984 Week
» 4722 Month
» 132165 Year
» 1797541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1224
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1631   10/1918
O4 6260   19/07/1924
O4 6297   29/06/1929
O4 6190   09/09/1931
O4 5390   19/07/1934
O4 6190   16/01/1937