Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 302 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5021 Week
» 16166 Month
» 115951 Year
» 1781327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1181
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
C5 364   12/1906
O4 1860   03/1918
O4 6318   01/11/1924
O4 6533   09/11/1929
O4 6359   12/12/1931
O4 6362   13/10/1934
O4 6553   20/02/1937
O4 6191   18/11/1939
O4 6292   15/08/1942