Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 252 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1160 Week
» 12305 Month
» 112090 Year
» 1777466 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3203
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5398   17/08/1935
O4 6373   14/08/1937
O4 6327   16/12/1939
O4 6191   04/07/1942
O4 5381   27/04/1946
O4 63771   18/12/1948