Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 503 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5490 Week
» 13605 Month
» 141048 Year
» 1806424 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1016
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6618   05/12/1930
O4 6617   06/08/1932
O4 6537   10/11/1934
O4 6332   31/12/1936
O4 6551   17/06/1939
O4 6227   08/01/1944
O4 3539   24/08/1946
O4 63739   12/02/1949