Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 359 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18162 Week
» 71178 Month
» 190705 Year
» 3217558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #22264
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
63754 |
|
03/05/1952 |
O4 |
63576 |
|
22/01/1955 |
O4 |
63700 |
|
08/03/1958 |
O4 |
63906 |
|
18/05/1961 |
|