Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 151 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2316 Week
» 2316 Month
» 69178 Year
» 1734554 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1168
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2148   06/1919
O4 6194   31/12/1926
O4 6263   06/07/1929
O4 6633   07/07/1931
O4 6219   27/01/1934
O4 5418   05/03/1938