Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 711 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 711 Week
» 19612 Month
» 19612 Year
» 1684988 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1870
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1195   22/01/1921
O4 5393   28/04/1928
O4 6340   03/12/1932
O4 6258   29/06/1935
O4 6214   14/08/1937