Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 239 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5770 Week
» 30604 Month
» 64936 Year
» 1730312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #804
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6203   31/05/1927
O4 6344   13/03/1931
O4 6195   18/05/1935
O4 6543   12/02/1938
O4 6321   07/08/1940
O4 6326   04/09/1943
O4 3908   31/10/1947
O4 63584   28/01/1950