Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 876 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5503 Week
» 7241 Month
» 134684 Year
» 1800060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3288
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6565   17/04/1937
O4 5395   19/08/1939
O4 6195   07/03/1942
O4 6349   07/10/1944
O4 3729   30/11/1946
O4 63864   16/04/1949