Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 638 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6169 Week
» 31003 Month
» 65335 Year
» 1730711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28284
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63784   13/01/1951
O1 63689   28/02/1953
O1 63610   25/06/1955
O1 63711   07/12/1957