Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 290 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5009 Week
» 16154 Month
» 115939 Year
» 1781315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #515
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6198   24/05/1924
O4 6272   23/07/1929
O4 6341   11/07/1931
O4 6622   02/09/1933
O4 5380   11/04/1936
O4 6298   04/02/1939
O4 6234   02/08/1941