Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 107 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3496 Week
» 22397 Month
» 22397 Year
» 1687773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1465
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1199   09/1912
O4 1248   18/01/1919
O4 1224   15/10/1921
O4 6211   01/11/1924
O4 6343   30/03/1927