Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 45 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5602 Week
» 16747 Month
» 116532 Year
» 1781908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1939
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1200   15/10/1921
O4 6224   19/09/1925
O4 6199   24/06/1930
O4 6606   11/03/1933
O4 6308   23/03/1935