Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 457 Today
» 642 Yesterday
» 4781 Week
» 11489 Month
» 164442 Year
» 1829818 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3277
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6199   18/03/1939
O4 6591   15/08/1942
O4 6589   04/03/1944
O4 3587   07/12/1946
O4 63907   22/07/1950