Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2153 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25784 Week
» 90738 Month
» 293402 Year
» 3320255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1187
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
5014 |
|
21/01/1933 |
O4 |
6582 |
|
16/11/1935 |
O4 |
6216 |
|
11/02/1939 |
O4 |
6199 |
|
25/07/1942 |
O4 |
6296 |
|
17/03/1945 |
O4 |
3703 |
|
30/12/1947 |
|