Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 103 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1172 Week
» 1172 Month
» 68034 Year
» 1733410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1020
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6325   28/10/1933
O4 6581   14/09/1935
O4 6239   05/06/1937
O4 6204   08/07/1939
O4 6272   24/01/1942
O4 6200   11/11/1944
O4 3751   12/10/1946
O4 63599   26/02/1949