Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 671 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5142 Week
» 16188 Month
» 16188 Year
» 1681564 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1468
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1202   10/1912
O4 1214   15/12/1917
O4 1224   15/12/1923
O4 6376   18/06/1929
O4 6555   27/06/1931
O4 6530   23/12/1933