Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 637 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1545 Week
» 12690 Month
» 112475 Year
» 1777851 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1029
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6202   02/12/1933
O4 5387   14/03/1936
O4 6314   08/10/1938
O4 6290   19/10/1940
O4 6552   08/05/1943