Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 295 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1136 Week
» 15072 Month
» 142515 Year
» 1807891 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1236
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6203   22/07/1933
O4 6216   04/01/1936
O4 5414   04/03/1939
O4 5398   17/06/1944
O4 63626   31/05/1948