Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 46 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5603 Week
» 16748 Month
» 116533 Year
» 1781909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3339
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6360   30/07/1938
O4 6624   14/12/1940
O4 6539   09/01/1943
O4 6203   23/06/1945
O4 3642   25/10/1947
O4 63878   13/05/1950